Global Patent Index - EP 0913886 B1

EP 0913886 B1 2003-06-11 - Miniaturized female terminal

Title (en)

Miniaturized female terminal

Title (de)

Miniaturisiertes Steckkontaktelement

Title (fr)

Borne femelle miniaturisée

Publication

EP 0913886 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119462 A

Priority

DE 29719153 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913886A2] A base area (5) next to a contact area (4) has a level bottom wall (7) and side walls vertical to it. Fixed to the bottom wall's entering edges (31, 34) are spring contact arms (37, 38) slightly narrower than the bottom wall and the top wall. These arms protrude, tapering inwards to a contact line (40). Their open ends (41, 42) veer outwards from the contact line and form a funnel (45).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/03 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 4/185 (2013.01); H01R 13/03 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719153 U1 19990304; EP 0913886 A2 19990506; EP 0913886 A3 20010103; EP 0913886 B1 20030611; ES 2201389 T3 20040316; US 6126495 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051017

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2005-10-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201389 T3

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808684 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010623

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI