Global patent index - EP 0913889 A3

EP 0913889 A3 2001-03-07 - Coupling element for an electric cable

Title (en)

Coupling element for an electric cable

Title (de)

Kupplungselement eines elektrischen Kabels

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion d' un câble électrique

Publication

EP 0913889 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98402273 A

Priority

DE 19748044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913889A2] The element comprises a closed cover (8) which borders closely on a contact carrier (2) and overlaps apertures (7) going through the contact carrier. The cover comprises a passage (9), at whose edges the cable borders. A protection body (6) surrounds the cover and the passage, and connects the protection body sealingly to the contact carrier and the cable (1). The element comprises a contact carrier (2), on which a protection body (6) which encloses a cable end, is formed in such way, that an area (4) of the surface of the contact carrier remains free, and the free area comprises apertures (7) which go through the contact carrier, in which contacts are arranged, connected with a wire of the cable (1). A closed cover (8) is provided, which borders closely on the contact carrier and overlaps the apertures. The cover comprises a passage (9), at whose edges the cable borders. The protection body surrounds the cover and the passage, and connects the protection body sealingly to the contact carrier and the cable. An Independent claim is provided for a manufacture of the element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52; H01R 43/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/56 (2006.01); H01R 43/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5205 (2013.01); H01R 13/56 (2013.01); H01R 43/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913889 A2 19990506; EP 0913889 A3 20010307; EP 0913889 B1 20031112; AT 254344 T 20031115; DE 19748044 A1 19990506; JP 4074392 B2 20080409; JP H11219751 A 19990810; US 6171147 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110915

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110915

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEXANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEXANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810150

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/52 A, 7H 01R 43/24 B

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI