Global patent index - EP 0913915 A3

EP 0913915 A3 2001-04-18 - Switched-mode power supply

Title (en)

Switched-mode power supply

Title (de)

Schaltnetzteil

Title (fr)

Alimentation de puissance à découpage

Publication

EP 0913915 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98119702 A

Priority

DE 19747801 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0913915A2] Switched-mode power supplies require a power factor correction circuit in order to comply with anticipated regulations for the harmonic load on the line network. The object is to specify a switched-mode power supply of this type, which operates reliably over a wide input voltage range. In its second current path (I2), which produces a connection between a rectifier element (BR) and a tap (A) on the primary winding (W1) of a transformer (TR), the switched-mode power supply contains a capacitor (C19) which produces current limiting for an inductance (L19) in this current path. When the switching transistor (T60) is in the switching mode the inductance (L19) is charged, when the switching transistor (T60) is switched on, in the sense of an energy store until the capacitor (C19) is charged. When the switching transistor (T60) is switched off, the inductance (L19) and the capacitor (C19) are discharged via a diode (D18) in the direction of an energy-storage capacitor (C20). Particular applications include television sets and similar consumer electronics equipment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02M 1/12; H02M 3/335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 3/28 (2006.01); H02M 1/00 (2007.01); H02M 1/14 (2006.01); H02M 1/40 (2007.01); H02M 1/42 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 1/40 (2013.01); H02M 1/4258 (2013.01); Y02B 70/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0913915 A2 19990506; EP 0913915 A3 20010418; EP 0913915 B1 20030312; CN 1124676 C 20031015; CN 1216876 A 19990519; DE 19747801 A1 19990506; ES 2193461 T3 20031101; JP 4204115 B2 20090107; JP H11215815 A 19990806; US 5986898 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-01-23 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193461

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-23 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69812034

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-01-16 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20011005

2002-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI