Global Patent Index - EP 0914183 A4

EP 0914183 A4 2000-11-02 - BLADDER WATER GUN, IMPROVED BLADDER AND NOZZLE

Title (en)

BLADDER WATER GUN, IMPROVED BLADDER AND NOZZLE

Title (de)

WASSERPISTOLE MIT VERBESSERUNGEN AN BLASE UND DÜSE

Title (fr)

PISTOLET A EAU A POCHE EXTENSIBLE, POCHE EXTENSIBLE AMELIOREE ET GICLEUR

Publication

EP 0914183 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932463 A

Priority

  • US 9711613 W
  • US 67294196 A
  • US 67294296 A
  • US 67293396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800214A1] An expandable bladder toy water gun (1) is provided. It includes a main housing (3) having a barrel (9), a water ejection nozzle (11), a handle (5), a trigger (7), a water storage tank (33), a hand pump (45) as well as an inflatable bladder (13) connected to the main housing (3). The pump (45) is connected to both the tank (33) and the bladder (13). There is a bladder release valve (31) with an upstream side connected to the bladder (13) and a downstream side connected to the nozzle (11) for water ejection when the trigger (7) is pulled. The elasticity of the bladder (13) is used as the motive force for liquid ejection. The bladder is a tubular member which has a section (91) of weakened elastic strength relative to the remainder of the member. In one embodiment, the bladder has a variable diameter, larger at its front end and smaller at its back end. In another embodiment, the bladder has a constant diameter with a wall thickness gradient. The nozzle (11) includes a turbulence control member (213) for enhanced laminar flow ejection which control member has a plurality of linear stream guidance walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 3/18; F41B 9/00; F15D 1/06; B05B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/18 (2006.01); A63H 33/30 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); F15D 1/06 (2006.01); F41B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15D 1/02 (2013.01); B05B 1/34 (2013.01); F15B 1/165 (2013.01); F41B 9/0009 (2013.01); F41B 9/0012 (2013.01); F15B 2201/20 (2013.01); F15B 2201/3152 (2013.01); F15B 2201/3158 (2013.01); F15B 2201/411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800214 A1 19980108; AT 302052 T 20050915; AU 3591797 A 19980121; AU 726843 B2 20001123; CA 2268924 A1 19980108; CA 2268924 C 20061017; CA 2486645 A1 19980108; CA 2486645 C 20060530; DE 69734001 D1 20050922; DE 69734001 T2 20060413; EP 0914183 A1 19990512; EP 0914183 A4 20001102; EP 0914183 B1 20050817; ES 2247634 T3 20060301; NZ 333049 A 20001124; NZ 505248 A 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070627

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060627

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247634 T3

2006-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060117

2005-11-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69734001 P 20050922

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LARAMI LIMITED

2005-06-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: D ANDRADE, BRUCE M.

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2000-11-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63H 3/18 A, 7F 41B 9/00 B, 7F 15D 1/06 B, 7B 05B 1/34 B

1999-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 63H 3/18 A, 6F 41B 9/00 B

1999-06-30 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19981212

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990212

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE