Global patent index - EP 0914196 B1

EP 0914196 B1 2000-08-16 - DEVICE FOR MIXING AT LEAST TWO LIQUIDS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MIXING AT LEAST TWO LIQUIDS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON WENIGSTENS ZWEI FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR MELANGER AU MOINS DEUX LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 0914196 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928233 A

Priority

  • DE 19625651 A
  • EP 9703176 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19625651A1] The invention relates to a device for mixing at least two liquids. Said device has a first relatively small container (1) for volume metering of a first liquid and a second, larger container (2) which can be filled with the first liquid and another liquid. Particularly small measurements of the mixing device and short tubes are achieved when the first container (1) is arranged inside the second container (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0454 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625651 A1 19980108; DE 19625651 C2 20001130; AT 195438 T 20000915; DE 59702214 D1 20000921; EP 0914196 A1 19990512; EP 0914196 B1 20000816; ID 17170 A 19971204; JP 3174070 B2 20010611; JP H11513931 A 19991130; KR 20000022178 A 20000425; US 2001038574 A1 20011108; WO 9749483 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEAG MICROTECH G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-06-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010511

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702214

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195438

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990927

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981118

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL