Global Patent Index - EP 0914222 B1

EP 0914222 B1 2000-03-08 - SHROUDING MEANS

Title (en)

SHROUDING MEANS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR ABSCHIRMUNG

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 0914222 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97931931 A

Priority

  • GB 9701911 W
  • GB 9615765 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804370A1] A means to shroud molten metal flowing from an outlet in a molten metal handling vessel, comprises a tubular shroud (20) having an enlarged head portion (22) to be fixed to the underside of the vessel in correspondence with the outlet, and a sleeve or collar (10, 40) to fit over the tubular shroud, with one end (11, 41) of the sleeve or collar (10, 40) in contact with the enlarged head portion (22), the sleeve or collar (10, 40) having an inlet (12, 42) for gas and a gas conduit (13, 43) to lead the gas to the interior of the enlarged head portion (22) of the shroud (20). The vessel may be a ladle and the shrouding means may be fixed to the underside of the ladle or it may be fixed to the ladle via a slide gate valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 37/00; B22D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/106 (2006.01); B22D 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 37/005 (2013.01); B22D 11/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804370 A1 19980205; AR 007971 A1 19991124; AT 190253 T 20000315; AU 3551497 A 19980220; DE 69701401 D1 20000413; EP 0914222 A1 19990512; EP 0914222 B1 20000308; GB 9615765 D0 19960904; TW 358047 B 19990511; ZA 9706433 B 19980302

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010715

2001-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010715

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-06-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-06-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701401 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190253 T 20000315

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990121

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE