Global patent index - EP 0914243 B1

EP 0914243 B1 2000-01-12 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUS EXTRACTION OF A LIQUID CONTAINED IN A RAW MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUS EXTRACTION OF A LIQUID CONTAINED IN A RAW MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSENTZUG IN ROHMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION D'EXTRACTION EN CONTINU D'UN LIQUIDE CONTENU DANS UNE MATIERE PREMIERE

Publication

EP 0914243 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97920779 A

Priority

  • FR 9700696 W
  • FR 9606006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743113A1] The invention discloses a method for continuous extraction of a liquid contained in a raw material, characterised in that in a first section A of an extruding machine (1), the raw material is introduced and the following operations are carried out: a first mixing and a first heating operation, at least one pressing and one filtering operation on the material, at least one compression and one shearing operation, at least a second mixing and a second heating operation, and in a second section B of the said extruding machine (1), at least one pressing and one filtering operation on the material, and in a third section C of the said extruding machine (1), the dry residue of the said material is compressed and extruded. The invention also features a continuous extracting installation for implementing the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/16; C11B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/16 (2006.01); C11B 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/16 (2013.01); B30B 9/163 (2013.01); C11B 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743113 A1 19971120; AT 188645 T 20000115; DE 69701151 D1 20000217; DE 69701151 T2 20000525; EP 0914243 A1 19990512; EP 0914243 B1 20000112; FR 2748685 A1 19971121; FR 2748685 B1 19980814

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CLEXTRAL

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070508

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-04-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69701151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188645

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981109

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL