Global patent index - EP 0914503 B1

EP 0914503 B1 2000-12-27 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF LYOCELL FIBRE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF LYOCELL FIBRE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LYOCELL-FASER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES DE CELLULOSE FILEES A L'AIDE D'UN SOLVANT ORGANIQUE

Publication

EP 0914503 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97932910 A

Priority

  • GB 9701959 W
  • GB 9615431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803707A1] Never-dried lyocell fibres can be treated with an aqueous solution which contains an alkali metal hydroxide and from 1 to 50 grams per litre of an alkali metal silicate (calculated as anhydrous sodium metasilicate). The presence of the silicate serves to minimise the potential for damage to the fibre during this alkaline treatment step, particularly when the solution contains from 5 to 15 percent by weight sodium hydroxide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803707 A1 19980129; AT 198360 T 20010115; AU 3627897 A 19980210; DE 69703802 D1 20010201; DE 69703802 T2 20010621; EP 0914503 A1 19990512; EP 0914503 B1 20001227; GB 9615431 D0 19960904; ID 17452 A 19980108; KR 20000067926 A 20001125; TW 385341 B 20000321

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-03-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010721

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010721

2001-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703802

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-12-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198360

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TENCEL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990608

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990222

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE