Global Patent Index - EP 0914521 B1

EP 0914521 B1 2000-04-12 - DEVICE FOR DAMPING VIBRATION IN A CABLE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DAMPING VIBRATION IN A CABLE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM DÄMPFEN VON SCHWINGUNGEN IN KABELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR AMORTIR LES VIBRATIONS D'UN CABLE

Publication

EP 0914521 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97935609 A

Priority

  • FR 9701374 W
  • FR 9609449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804780A1] A device including a first member (20) surrounding and secured to a section of a cable (6), a second member (22) connected to an element (12) to which a portion of the cable (6) is attached, and arranged around said first member, a resilient or viscoelastic ring (24) engaging the first member (20) and the second member (22), and a flexible container housed in a ring-shaped compartment (30) between the two members and filled with a viscous substance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 1/00 (2006.01); E01D 19/14 (2006.01); F16F 13/06 (2006.01); F16F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804780 A1 19980205; CA 2260834 A1 19980205; DE 69701700 D1 20000518; DE 69701700 T2 20001123; DK 0914521 T3 20000925; EP 0914521 A1 19990512; EP 0914521 B1 20000412; ES 2146480 T3 20000801; FR 2751673 A1 19980130; FR 2751673 B1 19981002; GR 3033573 T3 20000929; HK 1019904 A1 20001229; JP 2000515943 A 20001128; NO 990326 A 19990325; NO 990326 D0 19990125; PT 914521 E 20000831; US 6334608 B1 20020101

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020723

2003-03-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-02-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL (STUP)

- Effective date: 20020731

2003-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010801

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010629

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010613

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146480 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701700 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990817

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990202

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT