Global Patent Index - EP 0914531 B1

EP 0914531 B1 2001-05-30 - DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING PREFABRICATED CONCRETE PARTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING PREFABRICATED CONCRETE PARTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBUND VON BETONFERTIGTEILEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PIECES PREFABRIQUEES EN BETON

Publication

EP 0914531 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941886 A

Priority

  • DE 29612573 U
  • EP 9703870 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803751A1] A device for assembling prefabricated concrete parts has a cable loop anchored at one end to the prefabricated concrete part. The other loop-like end cooperates with a retaining means provided at the front face of the prefabricated concrete part to elastically bend the cable loop approximately at right angle during the fabrication of the prefabricated concrete part, and to release it for assembling. An elongated, U-shaped box (1) having a substantially uniform cross-section is provided as retaining means. The bottom (2) of the box has one or several passages (4) for the cable loop (5) and means arranged in the area of the passages (4) to retain the cable loop (5) perpendicularly to the longitudinal extension of the box (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/14; E04B 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 23/00 (2006.01); E01F 8/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/41 (2006.01); E04G 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/142 (2013.01); B28B 23/005 (2013.01); E01F 8/0023 (2013.01); E04B 1/415 (2013.01); E04G 21/126 (2013.01); Y10T 403/475 (2013.01); Y10T 403/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29723990 U1 19990902; AT 201736 T 20010615; AU 4377497 A 19980210; DE 29612573 U1 19971120; DE 29723989 U1 19990902; DK 0914531 T3 20010820; EP 0914531 A1 19990512; EP 0914531 B1 20010530; PL 187348 B1 20040630; PL 331152 A1 19990621; US 6102607 A 20000815; WO 9803751 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170717

2017-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 201736 T

- Effective date: 20170718

2017-08-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170717

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-24 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170718

2017-07-19 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170717

2017-07-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703683

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160917

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PFEIFER SEIL- UND HEBETECHNIK GMBH & CO, 87700 MEMMINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59703683

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703683

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PFISTER & PFISTER, DE

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703683

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PFISTER & PFISTER, DE

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2003-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-07-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BETOMAX KUNSTSTOFF- UND METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH & C

2002-04-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BETOMAX KUNSTSTOFF- UND METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH & C

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703683 20010705

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201736 T 20010615

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990617

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990203

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE