Global Patent Index - EP 0914554 B1

EP 0914554 B1 2002-11-27 - PUMP NOZZLE

Title (en)

PUMP NOZZLE

Title (de)

PUMPENDÜSE

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR-POMPE

Publication

EP 0914554 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928289 A

Priority

  • DE 19721241 A
  • EP 9802917 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721241C1] The invention relates to a pump nozzle (1) for injecting fuel into an internal combustion engine, especially a single cylinder diesel engine, comprising a piston foot (3), a pump cylinder (8), a pump piston (7), an intermediate disk (16), and an injection nozzle with a pressure spring (14), a pressure spring plate (15) and a nozzle needle (20). The inventive pump nozzle has a reduced construction length by virtue of the pressure spring (14) being offset to the side of the nozzle needle axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/02; F02M 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/28 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F02M 59/48 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/48 (2013.01); F02M 55/00 (2013.01); F02M 57/023 (2013.01); F02M 59/102 (2013.01); F02M 59/28 (2013.01); F02M 59/44 (2013.01); F02M 61/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721241 C1 19981105; CN 1083936 C 20020501; CN 1226949 A 19990825; EP 0914554 A1 19990512; EP 0914554 B1 20021127; JP 2000515609 A 20001121; US 6202940 B1 20010320; WO 9853196 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080518

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806428 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020208

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990312

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT