Global Patent Index - EP 0914674 B1

EP 0914674 B1 2003-06-11 - ELECTRIC LAMP

Title (en)

ELECTRIC LAMP

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE

Title (fr)

AMPOULE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0914674 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951065 A

Priority

  • DE 9702639 W
  • DE 19716158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848448A1] The invention concerns the attachment of coiled filaments to supply leads in electric lamps. One end (41) of the supply lead is flattened and U-shaped. The U-shaped section (41) of the supply lead forms a slot-shaped receptacle (45) for a helical coiled filament end (3a), the slot -width of which is narrower than the outside diameter of the coiled filament end (3a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/16; H01J 61/067; H01K 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/067 (2006.01); H01K 1/16 (2006.01); H01K 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/16 (2013.01); H01J 61/0672 (2013.01); H01K 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848448 A1 19981029; AT 242916 T 20030615; CA 2255081 A1 19981029; CA 2255081 C 20060725; CN 1106682 C 20030423; CN 1222249 A 19990707; EP 0914674 A1 19990512; EP 0914674 B1 20030611; ES 2201335 T3 20040316; HU 222632 B1 20030929; HU 9901363 A2 19990830; HU 9901363 A3 20000828; JP 2000512802 A 20000926; KR 100393462 B1 20030919; KR 20000016646 A 20000325; NO 321194 B1 20060403; NO 986003 A 19981218; NO 986003 D0 19981218; US 6191526 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59710277

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59710277

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59710277

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59710277

- Effective date: 20111130

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071111

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071111

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071111

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061113

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061111

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061111

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061112

2006-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201335 T3

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710277 P 20030717

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001228

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE