Global Patent Index - EP 0914839 A3

EP 0914839 A3 2001-05-09 - Protective helmet with connecting devices for the detachable attachment of a strapless breathing mask

Title (en)

Protective helmet with connecting devices for the detachable attachment of a strapless breathing mask

Title (de)

Schutzhelm mit Verbindungsvorrichtungen zur lösbaren Befestigung einer bänderlosen Atemschutzmaske

Title (fr)

Casque de protection avec moyens de raccord pour une fixation démontable d'un masque respiratoire sans courroies

Publication

EP 0914839 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120167 A

Priority

AT 186797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914839A2] The protective helmet (2) has couplings (25,37) at the helmet side at the helmet and/or a carrier frame (18) which, in a locking setting, are resistant to push and pull forces with the helmet or carrier frame around the interior. At least the two couplings (25) at the helmet sides (20) can be moved between connection and rest settings. The coupling sections have a number of positioning units and/or locks along their length to act together with the couplings (31,38) of the breathing mask (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914839 A2 19990512; EP 0914839 A3 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011110

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI