Global Patent Index - EP 0914846 A3

EP 0914846 A3 2000-02-02 - Auxiliary apparatus for a ski

Title (en)

Auxiliary apparatus for a ski

Title (de)

Hilfsvorrichtung für Ski

Title (fr)

Appareil auxiliaire pour ski

Publication

EP 0914846 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309164 A

Priority

JP 34569297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914846A2] The invention provides auxiliary apparatus (10) for a snow ski which comprises a V-shaped elastic body having a first spring (12) and a second elastic plate spring (14), a restraining member (16) and an elastic ring (50), said first elastic plate spring (12) being integrally provided on a ski plate (1), a rear free end portion (14b) of said second elastic plate spring (14) being vertically movable, said restraining member (16) being integrally fixed on said ski plate (1) at a rear end portion (12b) of said first elastic plate (12), said elastic ring (50) being integrally provided under said second elastic plate spring (14) to locate between said first and second plate springs and also in said restraining member (16), and an elastic sheet (58) being integrally mounted on an upper surface of the upper plate spring (14) to locate between the screw openings (14e), (14e) whereby vertical lift can be generated between an upper ski surface and a ski boot (40) in order to obtain greater control and stability for a skier running on an uneven snow surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2006.01); A63C 5/075 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914846 A2 19990512; EP 0914846 A3 20000202; JP H11137765 A 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2001-01-31 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000824

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI