Global Patent Index - EP 0914847 B1

EP 0914847 B1 2001-03-21 - Ski binding

Title (en)

Ski binding

Title (de)

Skibindung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue d'une chaussure sur un ski

Publication

EP 0914847 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98410120 A

Priority

FR 9714202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914847A1] The boot (5) is restrained on the ski by jaws (4) pivoting against a spring system (6,9,11,12) whose longitudinal axis (ZZ') is contained in a longitudinal and vertical plane (P). The jaws are supported on two spindles (XX',YY') located either side the longitudinal plane. These spindles enable the jaw to pivot outwards (EX) or inwards (IN) laterally from its central position. The orthogonal projection of one of the spindles on a transverse plane (T) orthogonal to the longitudinal plane is different to the plane of symmetry relative to the longitudinal plane of the projection on the transverse and orthogonal plane of the other support spindle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/085 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/08521 (2013.01); A63C 9/08564 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914847 A1 19990512; EP 0914847 B1 20010321; AT 199836 T 20010415; DE 69800624 D1 20010426; DE 69800624 T2 20011018; FR 2770787 A1 19990514; FR 2770787 B1 20000114; US 6092831 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800624

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091020

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800624 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199836 T 20010415

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI