Global Patent Index - EP 0914871 A3

EP 0914871 A3 2000-05-10 - Spray nozzle

Title (en)

Spray nozzle

Title (de)

Zerstäubungsdüse

Title (fr)

Buse de pulvérisation

Publication

EP 0914871 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308944 A

Priority

GB 9723535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914871A2] A spray nozzle comprises a fluid tip (1), an air cap (2) seated on the body of the fluid tip (1) to form a fluid tip/air cap assembly (1, 2), and an annular passage (4) between the fluid tip (1) and the air cap (2). A plurality of tangentially arranged passages (3) are angled to the exterior of the fluid tip/air cap assembly (1, 2). They extend from the exterior of the fluid tip/air cap assembly (1, 2) to the annular passage (4) and are located in the region of the connection between the air cap (2) and the fluid tip (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/06; B05B 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/06 (2006.01); B05B 7/06 (2006.01); B05B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/10 (2013.01); B05B 7/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914871 A2 19990512; EP 0914871 A3 20000510; CA 2252318 A1 19990505; GB 2331031 A 19990512; GB 9723535 D0 19980107; JP H11197551 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI