Global Patent Index - EP 0914913 A3

EP 0914913 A3 2000-10-18 - Device for the edge trimming of round wood

Title (en)

Device for the edge trimming of round wood

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Kantholz aus Rundhölzern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de bois équarri à partir de troncs d'arbre

Publication

EP 0914913 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890194 A

Priority

AT 68897 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914913A2] The square timber producing device includes a coarse chipping device (3) with a pair of chipping discs (4,5), followed by a fine chipping device (12) with a similar pair of discs (13,14). There is also a second stage with coarse (16) and fine (17) chipping devices, also with discs (18-21). The chipping discs are in truncated cone form and have tools with radially directed cutters running along a spiral on the endface of the discs. The coarse disc cutters have a height difference from one cutter to the next of about 1-5 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914913 A2 19990512; EP 0914913 A3 20001018; EP 0914913 B1 20031112; AT 2298 U1 19980825; DE 59810151 D1 20031218

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-07-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810151 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE

2001-07-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010411

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI