Global Patent Index - EP 0914943 B1

EP 0914943 B1 2001-12-05 - Method for driving a printing machine having an integrated imaging device

Title (en)

Method for driving a printing machine having an integrated imaging device

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Antrieb einer Druckmaschine mit einer integrierten Bebilderungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour entraîner une machine à imprimer avec un dispositif de l'écriture intégré

Publication

EP 0914943 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120545 A

Priority

DE 19748119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914943A1] The printing machine has an impression cylinder (1) and at least one cylinder group consisting of an offset cylinder (9) and a printing form cylinder (10), an imaging device(16), an ink fountain (19) and a sheet feeder and extractor. The cylinders are linked by a drive wheel train. The printing form cylinder is detached from the drive wheel train and is driven by its own drive during the imaging process at the imaging speed. In an operating phase position the drive for the printing form cylinder is integrated in the drive wheel train.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008; B41F 7/10; B41F 13/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 7/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914943 A1 19990512; EP 0914943 B1 20011205; DE 19748119 A1 19990506; DE 19748119 B4 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802314

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59802314

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091030

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091030

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-06 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20031104

2002-10-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802314 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-07-14 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19990512

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI