Global Patent Index - EP 0914952 A3

EP 0914952 A3 2000-04-26 - Ink solvent dispenser system for inkjet printheads

Title (en)

Ink solvent dispenser system for inkjet printheads

Title (de)

Tintenlösemittelspendersystem für Tintenstrahldruckköpfe

Title (fr)

Système distributeur de solvent d'encre pour tête d'imprimante à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0914952 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98112898 A

Priority

US 96505397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0914952A2] An ink solvent dispenser system (100; 120) is provided for cleaning a printhead (70, 72, 74, 76) in an inkjet printing mechanism (20). The dispenser (100; 120) has an enclosure shell (102; 122) defining a reservoir (104; 124) filled with an ink solvent (110), such as polyethylene glycol ("PEG"). A back-pressure device (105; 125), such as a porous body (106) or a spring-bag structure (126, 128), is located inside the reservoir (104; 124) to prevent ink solvent leakage. The dispenser (100; 120) has a sintered, high density polyethylene plastic applicator (108; 135) in fluid communication with the ink solvent (110) stored within the reservoir (104; 124) in a space-efficient manner. The applicator (108; 135) uses capillary forces to extract the ink solvent (110) from the reservoir (104; 124) for application to a printhead wiper (90, 92, 94, 96) contacting the applicator (108; 135). The wiper (90, 92, 94, 96) wipes across the printhead (70, 72, 74, 76), after which ink residue (112) is scraped (114) from the wiper (90, 92, 94, 96) prior to receiving the next dose of solvent (110). A method is also provided of dispensing ink solvent (110), along with an inkjet printing mechanism (20) having provisions for replaceably receiving the ink solvent dispenser system (100; 120). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16552 (2013.01); B41J 2/16541 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0914952 A2 19990512; EP 0914952 A3 20000426; JP H11198410 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI