Global Patent Index - EP 0915066 B1

EP 0915066 B1 2003-06-18 - DIELECTRIC CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND DIELECTRIC RESONATOR MADE BY USING THE SAME

Title (en)

DIELECTRIC CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND DIELECTRIC RESONATOR MADE BY USING THE SAME

Title (de)

DIELEKTRISCHE KERAMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND RESONATOR DARAUS

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION CERAMIQUE DIELECTRIQUE ET RESONATEUR DIELECTRIQUE CON U A PARTIR DE CETTE COMPOSITION

Publication

EP 0915066 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911165 A

Priority

  • JP 9801512 W
  • JP 8365697 A
  • JP 17257697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915066A1] The present invention provides a dielectric ceramic composition having a high dielectric constant and a high Q value in high frequency ranges, and also having a temperature coefficient tau f of resonance frequency capable of being controlled stably in a small range. The dielectric ceramic composition contains at least lanthanide Ln, Al, Sr and Ti as metal elements, and has a composition for the metal elements, represented by the composition formula of aLn2Ox . bAl2O3 . cSrO . dTiO2, wherein a, b, c, d and x are confined as follows in mole ratio: 0.2194 < a </= 0.4500, 0.2194 < b </= 0.4500, 0.1000 </= c </= 0.4610, 0.1000 </= d </= 0.4610, 3 </= x </= 4, and a + b + c + d = 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/46; C04B 35/462; C04B 35/50; H01B 3/12; H01P 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/46 (2006.01); C04B 35/478 (2006.01); C04B 35/50 (2006.01); H01B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/478 (2013.01); H01B 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915066 A1 19990512; EP 0915066 A4 20000719; EP 0915066 B1 20030618; DE 69815631 D1 20030724; DE 69815631 T2 20040429; KR 20000016408 A 20000325; US 6025291 A 20000215; WO 9843924 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2006-04-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815631 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2000-07-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 04B 35/46 A, 7C 04B 35/50 B, 7H 01B 3/12 B, 7C 04B 35/462 B, 7H 01P 7/10 B

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE