Global Patent Index - EP 0915070 B8

EP 0915070 B8 2003-06-25 - Method of making carbon fibre reinforced ceramified shaped body and use of such a shaped body

Title (en)

Method of making carbon fibre reinforced ceramified shaped body and use of such a shaped body

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit Kohlenstoff-Fasern verstärkten, keramisierten Formkörpers und Verwendung eines solchen Formkörpers

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un corps moulé céramifié et renforcé par fibres de carbone et l'utilisation d'un tel corps moulé

Publication

EP 0915070 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 98119179 A

Priority

DE 19749462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749462C1] Silicon is infiltrated into the moulded body to increase its mechanical strength. Production of a moulded body reinforced with carbon fibres comprises infiltrating a porous carbon fibres containing preform of the moulded body made of polymer resin based on phenol and hardening, pyrolysing the green body obtained to convert the polymer resin into carbon into which silicon, preferably in liquid form, is infiltrated at 1400 deg C. Before pyrolysis, the preform infiltrated with polymer resin is heated to a heat treatment temperature which is 20-70 deg C above the temperature at which the polymer resin hardens. The heat treatment temperature is maintained for at least one hour and then the green body is cooled to room temperature at a rate \- 30 deg C/hour. During pyrolysis, the green body is subjected to mechanical pressure which increases with increasing green body thickness. After the pyrolysis has ceased, the green body is cooled to room temperature at a rate of 30-300 deg C/hour.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/80; C04B 35/573; F16D 69/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/573 (2006.01); C04B 35/80 (2006.01); F16D 69/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/573 (2013.01); C04B 35/806 (2013.01); F16D 69/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749462 C1 19990304; EP 0915070 A2 19990512; EP 0915070 A3 19990915; EP 0915070 B1 20030219; EP 0915070 B8 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807233 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010820

2000-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI