Global Patent Index - EP 0915195 B1

EP 0915195 B1 2002-09-18 - Device for connecting a heddle with a harness cord, heddle with such a device and loom with such a heddle

Title (en)

Device for connecting a heddle with a harness cord, heddle with such a device and loom with such a heddle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verbindung einer Weblitze mit einer Harnischkordel, Weblitze mit einer solchen Vorrichtung sowie Webmaschine mit einer solchen Weblitze

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accrochage d'une lisse à un cordon, lisse de métier à tisser comprenant un tel dispositif d'accrochage et métier à tisser équipé d'une telle lisse

Publication

EP 0915195 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420198 A

Priority

FR 9714181 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915195A1] The hitch to secure a heald (8) to a lifter cord (6), in a loom harness, has a molding (20) formed at the upper end of the heald, with an opening (22) to take the cord loop which is fixed by a sheath (24). The molding has two flexible legs (20B,20C) which can be distorted to reduce the apparent diameter of the molding, especially through the sheath (24). The legs extend from the molded base (20A) of the molding (20), and are held together at their ends by a molded strip (20D) with a thickness which is smaller than the leg width. The strip defines two passages (26,26') over the opening (22) in the molding. The strip has two cheeks (20E,20F), flanking the passages to guide the cord (6). The sections in contact with the cord have a relief surface structure (20G) to lock the cord in place. The lateral section of the unit has an H-shape. The upper end of the heald (8) is folded at right-angles to its axis, to lock into the molding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/40 (2006.01); D03C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/40 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3491 (2013.01); Y10T 24/39 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915195 A1 19990512; EP 0915195 B1 20020918; DE 69808018 D1 20021024; DE 69808018 T2 20030605; ES 2182252 T3 20030301; FR 2770541 A1 19990507; FR 2770541 B1 19991224; JP 3429207 B2 20030722; JP H11217744 A 19990810; PT 915195 E 20021231; TR 199802213 A2 19990521; TR 199802213 A3 19990521; US 6014989 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180731

2018-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69808018

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070504

2007-05-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070504

2005-11-04 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182252 T3

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808018 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990804

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI