Global Patent Index - EP 0915218 A3

EP 0915218 A3 2000-04-05 - Stand for spectators

Title (en)

Stand for spectators

Title (de)

Zuschauerranganordnung

Title (fr)

Gradins pour public

Publication

EP 0915218 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119677 A

Priority

DE 19748565 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915218A2] The auditorium structure has levels formed by self-supporting reinforced concrete slabs (1). Where they overlap, they are supported by U-shaped concrete units (9). The openings (8), for ventilation of the seats, are prepared in the slabs during casting. The leading end of each slab (1), towards the stage, has a shoulder (3) which extends vertically downwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915218 A2 19990512; EP 0915218 A3 20000405; DE 19748565 A1 19990520; DE 19748565 C2 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI