Global patent index - EP 0915226 A3

EP 0915226 A3 2000-03-08 - Self-adjusting draft stopper for door and window frames or the like

Title (en)

Self-adjusting draft stopper for door and window frames or the like

Title (de)

Selbsteinstellender Zug Stopper für Tür- und Fensterrahmen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Elément auto-réglable d'arrêt de tirage pour cadres de portes et de fenêtres ou similaire

Publication

EP 0915226 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120835 A

Priority

IT VI970185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915226A2] The draft stopper includes a fixed profiled member (2), which can be detachably anchored to the lower edge of a door (3) and faces the floor; a movable profiled member (4), which is inserted in the fixed profiled member (2) so that it can slide transversely with respect to it; a means (10, 11) for rigidly coupling the movable profiled member (4) to the fixed one (2); a pusher (12) which interacts with an abutment member which is rigidly coupled to the door frame (3) in order to promote the automatic spacing and, respectively, approach of the movable profiled member (4) with respect to the fixed one (2) and with respect to the floor during door opening or closure. The pusher (12) has a length which can vary elastically in a longitudinal direction in order to automatically adapt to discontinuities of the floor. The pusher (12) includes a substantially tubular body (13) with a longitudinal end (14) which is pivoted to the movable profiled member (4) and a rod (21) which is accommodated in the axial hole of the tubular body (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/215

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/215 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/215 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915226 A2 19990512; EP 0915226 A3 20000308; IT 1296362 B1 19990625; IT VI970185 A1 19980203

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000909

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI