Global patent index - EP 0915237 A3

EP 0915237 A3 2000-01-05 - Cooling system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cooling system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système de refroidissement pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0915237 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890316 A

Priority

AT 69597 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915237A2] The system has a cooling water pump (2) with a suction-side housing (1a) which is formed in one piece with the thermostat housing (1b). On a connecting part (18) for the heating back flow a flow deflection stirrup (19) is formed in one piece, which partly surrounds the thermostat (5). A retention for the thermostat is formed in one piece with a bearing part (4) for the cooling water pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/10; F01P 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F01P 11/00 (2006.01); F04D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F01P 7/16 (2013.01); F01P 11/00 (2013.01); F04D 15/0263 (2013.01); F01P 2070/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915237 A2 19990512; EP 0915237 A3 20000105; EP 0915237 B1 20020925; AT 224999 T 20021015; AT 2537 U1 19981228; DE 59805674 D1 20021031; US 6112706 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091009

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 08

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061029

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061029

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 09

2005-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021031

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 224999

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20021015

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI