Global Patent Index - EP 0915237 B1

EP 0915237 B1 2002-09-25 - Cooling system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cooling system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système de refroidissement pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0915237 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890316 A

Priority

AT 69597 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915237A2] The system has a cooling water pump (2) with a suction-side housing (1a) which is formed in one piece with the thermostat housing (1b). On a connecting part (18) for the heating back flow a flow deflection stirrup (19) is formed in one piece, which partly surrounds the thermostat (5). A retention for the thermostat is formed in one piece with a bearing part (4) for the cooling water pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/10; F01P 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F01P 11/00 (2006.01); F04D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F01P 7/16 (2013.01); F01P 11/00 (2013.01); F04D 15/0263 (2013.01); F01P 2070/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915237 A2 19990512; EP 0915237 A3 20000105; EP 0915237 B1 20020925; AT 224999 T 20021015; AT 2537 U1 19981228; DE 59805674 D1 20021031; US 6112706 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805674

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091009

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061029

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061029

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805674 20021031

2002-10-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224999 T 20021015

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI