Global Patent Index - EP 0915245 A3

EP 0915245 A3 2000-03-29 - Idle speed control apparatus for engine

Title (en)

Idle speed control apparatus for engine

Title (de)

Leerlaufdrehzahlsteuergerät für einen Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Appareil de régulation de la vitesse de ralenti pour un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0915245 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98121045 A

Priority

JP 30430897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915245A2] An apparatus for controlling the idle speed of an engine (2) is disclosed. The apparatus includes an electric control unit (ECU) (71) for controlling the engine speed, an air conditioner switch (65) for detecting application and removal of an external engine load, or air conditioner (37), and sensors (36, 66, 77) for detecting that the engine (2) is idling when the vehicle is stationary and when the vehicle is moving. The ECU (71) gradually increases the engine speed by a predetermined amount to shift the engine (2) to a raised idle state when the external engine load (37) is applied and gradually decreases the engine speed by the predetermined amount when the external engine load (37) is removed. The ECU (71) adjusts the engine speed at a certain rate when the vehicle is stationary and at a different rate when the vehicle is traveling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/16; F02D 41/08; F02D 41/38; F02D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 29/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/083 (2013.01); F02D 41/408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915245 A2 19990512; EP 0915245 A3 20000329; EP 0915245 B1 20030507; DE 69814303 D1 20030612; DE 69814303 T2 20040408; JP 3617281 B2 20050202; JP H11141380 A 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081105

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814303 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981105

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI