Global patent index - EP 0915252 A3

EP 0915252 A3 2000-03-15 - Common rail fuel injection system

Title (en)

Common rail fuel injection system

Title (de)

Common-Rail Einspritzsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'injection par alimentation commune des injecteurs

Publication

EP 0915252 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117887 A

Priority

CH 255797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915252A2] The rail (12) has an accommodation aperture (44) for a plunger cylinder (46) of the high pressure pump (16) with a delivery chamber (56) and a through passage (62). The delivery chamber is connected with the pressure chamber (20) of the rail (12) via the through passage. The injectors (24) have inlet apertures (38) open to the pressure chamber of the rail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02; F02M 39/02; F02M 61/14; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02M 39/00 (2006.01); F02M 39/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 39/00 (2013.01); F02M 39/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915252 A2 19990512; EP 0915252 A3 20000315; CA 2251148 A1 19990505; JP H11200986 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI