Global Patent Index - EP 0915257 A3

EP 0915257 A3 2000-05-31 - Positive displacement hydraulic machine

Title (en)

Positive displacement hydraulic machine

Title (de)

Hydraulische Verdrängermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine hydraulique volumétrique

Publication

EP 0915257 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120444 A

Priority

DE 19749060 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915257A2] At least one pair of opposing condenser plate segments (9) and/or flushing devices are movable towards one another. The rotary piston (4) has six vanes (5) and a ring chamber (6) in the housing (2) has six pressure medium spaces (7), which are connected with a suction and a pressure conduit (11-16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/063

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 7/00 (2006.01); F04C 2/063 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0057 (2013.01); F04C 2/063 (2013.01); F04C 2210/10 (2013.01); F04C 2210/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] DE 4003298 A1 19910808 - SCHENCK AG CARL [DE]
  • [DA] GOGODKIN ET AL.: "Applications of the Electrorheological Effect in Engineering Practice", FLUID MECHANICS SOVIET RESEARCH, vol. 8, no. 4, 1979, pages 48 - 61, XP002134741

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915257 A2 19990512; EP 0915257 A3 20000531; EP 0915257 B1 20040303; DE 19749060 A1 19990512; JP H11230058 A 19990824; US 6149391 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810892

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CARL *SCHENCK A.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAYER A.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-10-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CARL *SCHENCK A.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAYER A.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040916

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810892 P 20040408

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI