Global Patent Index - EP 0915298 A3

EP 0915298 A3 2000-04-26 - Current feedthrough

Title (en)

Current feedthrough

Title (de)

Stromdurchführungselement

Title (fr)

Transversée de courant

Publication

EP 0915298 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119860 A

Priority

DE 19749105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915298A2] The current leadthrough element has at least one electrode (4) mounted in an insulator (1) seated tightly in a ceramic holder (5) for fixing the current leadthrough element. The holder and insulator can be made in one piece from a ceramic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 3/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915298 A2 19990512; EP 0915298 A3 20000426; EP 0915298 B1 20030903; AT 249014 T 20030915; DE 19749105 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BERU AG, 71636 LUDWIGSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-04-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-04-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-04-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-04-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-02-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809477

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111020

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 249014 T

- Effective date: 20111020

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111020

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101011

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809477 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020820

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI