Global Patent Index - EP 0915304 A3

EP 0915304 A3 2001-05-02 - Three-pass boiler

Title (en)

Three-pass boiler

Title (de)

Dreizugheizkessel

Title (fr)

Chaudière à trois passages

Publication

EP 0915304 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120713 A

Priority

  • DE 29719718 U
  • DE 29719719 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915304A2] The triple-draft boiler has a guide plate (7) with legs (7) at both sides of the center vertical of the housing (4), at the center zone of the plate. The leg matches the shape of the housing, and has at least one row of space outflow openings (9) across the plate width (B). The outflow openings are slits with guide tabs (9'), angled downwards to extend into the back flow gap between the guide plate and the housing wall. At least one row of holes (8) is at the straight leg section (11) of the guide plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28; F24H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0015 (2013.01); F24H 1/285 (2013.01); F24H 9/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915304 A2 19990512; EP 0915304 A3 20010502; EP 0915304 B1 20050316; AT 291205 T 20050415

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812657

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VIESSMANN WERKE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812657 P 20050421

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIESSMANN WERKE GMBH & CO KG

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI