Global Patent Index - EP 0915305 A3

EP 0915305 A3 2001-05-02 - Heat pump

Title (en)

Heat pump

Title (de)

Wärmepumpentherme

Title (fr)

Pompe à chaleur

Publication

EP 0915305 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119384 A

Priority

DE 29719717 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915305A2] The support member (1) holds the evaporator (2) and the condenser (3) as well as heat exchangers for the transfer of heat to the room radiators. The support member has detachable connections (6,7) which connect to lead and return connections of the evaporator and condenser. The support has the form of a hydraulic board which can slide within the chamber. The housing (13) also contains an expansion chamber (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 4/02; F24H 9/02; F24H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 4/02 (2006.01); F24H 9/02 (2006.01); F24H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/02 (2013.01); F24H 4/02 (2013.01); F24H 9/14 (2013.01); F24H 9/142 (2013.01); F24H 9/148 (2013.01); Y02B 30/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915305 A2 19990512; EP 0915305 A3 20010502; DE 29719717 U1 19990401; NO 985157 A 19990507; NO 985157 D0 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI