Global Patent Index - EP 0915310 A3

EP 0915310 A3 2000-05-03 - Mounting of a panel to an appliance door

Title (en)

Mounting of a panel to an appliance door

Title (de)

Befestigung eines Türblatts an einer Gerätetür

Title (fr)

Montage d'un panneau sur une porte d'un appareil

Publication

EP 0915310 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113677 A

Priority

DE 19748679 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748679C1] A process is for aligning and fastening a door plate on the door of a built-in fridge or freezer. An upper side (1,8) of an angled holding piece is fastened provisionally on the top side of the appliance door in such a way that the other side (7) lies in parallel to the front side of the door. Gauges, guided in parallel guides of the above-mentioned side (7), are pushed out far enough for them to adjoin the bottom edges of the door plate. The angled holding piece is removed from the door and screwed on to the inside of the door plate with the side (7) that is parallel to the door. This fastening takes place after a flush alignment of the top ends of the gauges. The top side (1,8) of the holding piece, which is equipped with adjusting devices, is fastened on the top side of the door, and the door plate is aligned using these devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/10; A47B 77/08; A47L 15/42; E06B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/08 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01); F25D 23/10 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/10 (2013.01); A47B 77/08 (2013.01); A47L 15/4265 (2013.01); A47B 2096/208 (2013.01); F25D 23/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748679 C1 19981126; EP 0915310 A2 19990512; EP 0915310 A3 20000503; EP 0915310 B1 20030226; EP 1245916 A2 20021002; EP 1245916 A3 20021016; EP 1245916 B1 20050316; ES 2193446 T3 20031101; ES 2238524 T3 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150827

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130704

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193446 T3

2003-08-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-05-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LIEBHERR-HAUSGERAETE OCHSENHAUSEN GMBH

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807297 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19990512

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI