Global Patent Index - EP 0915421 B1

EP 0915421 B1 2001-03-07 - Semiconductor memory device capable of preventing malfunction due to disconnection of column select line or word select line

Title (en)

Semiconductor memory device capable of preventing malfunction due to disconnection of column select line or word select line

Title (de)

Halbleiterspeichergerät, um Fehlfunktion durch Spaltenauswahlleitungsunterbrechung oder Zeilenauswahlleitungsunterbrechung zu vermeiden

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur capable d'éviter le disfonctionnement dû à la déconnexion de lignes de sélection de colonnes ou de mots

Publication

EP 0915421 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99103686 A

Priority

  • EP 97103040 A
  • JP 4525596 A
  • JP 19820496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0793176A2] A column select line (CSL) includes a first layer column select line (CSLB) and a second layer column select line (CSLA) formed above the first layer column select line (CSLB) and connected thereto at any point. Furthermore, clamping circuits (7, 9) each for clamping each word line of paired main word lines (MWL, /MWL) at a constant potential are provided in a semiconductor memory device having main and secondary word line structure. With such a structure, malfunction due to multiselection of memory cells can be avoided even when the column select line (CSL) or the paired main word lines (MWL, /MWL) is disconnected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 11/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/20 (2006.01); G11C 8/08 (2006.01); G11C 8/10 (2006.01); G11C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/2007 (2013.01); G11C 8/08 (2013.01); G11C 8/10 (2013.01); G11C 29/70 (2013.01); G11C 29/78 (2013.01); G11C 29/832 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0793176 A2 19970903; EP 0793176 A3 19970917; EP 0793176 B1 19990602; DE 69700241 D1 19990708; DE 69700241 T2 19991104; DE 69704204 D1 20010412; DE 69704204 T2 20010712; EP 0915421 A2 19990512; EP 0915421 A3 19990623; EP 0915421 B1 20010307; US 5825694 A 19981020; US 5986915 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704204

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704204

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090225

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080208

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704204 20010412

2001-03-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 793176

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990820

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 793176

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB