Global Patent Index - EP 0915538 A3

EP 0915538 A3 2000-05-24 - Aligning device, especially for a conductor feeding apparatus having a conductor changing device for use in conductor processing machines

Title (en)

Aligning device, especially for a conductor feeding apparatus having a conductor changing device for use in conductor processing machines

Title (de)

Richteinrichtung, insbesondere für eine Leitungszuführeinrichtung mit Leitungswechsler für Leitungsverarbeitungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alignement, notamment pour un dispositif d'amenée des conducteurs ayant un dispositif de changement pour un machine de traitement des conducteurs

Publication

EP 0915538 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120128 A

Priority

DE 19749113 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0915538A2] The feed process allows multiple cables (9) to have the insulation removed from the ends and have connectors crimped onto them followed by insertion into the connector of an item of electrical equipment. The automated machine has a directional station, a transfer station and a cable adjustment station for pulling the cable into position. The directional station has a a pair of roller sets that form the feed unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2006.01); H01R 43/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2013.01); H01R 43/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0915538 A2 19990512; EP 0915538 A3 20000524; EP 0915538 B1 20020918; DE 19749113 A1 19990512

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805595 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI