Global Patent Index - EP 0915743 B1

EP 0915743 B1 2001-05-23 - DEVICE FOR SQUEEZING FLOWABLE MATERIAL OUT OF A TUBULAR BAG

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SQUEEZING FLOWABLE MATERIAL OUT OF A TUBULAR BAG

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUM AUSPRESSEN EINER FLIESSFÄHIGEN SUBSTANZ AUS EINEM SCHLAUCHBEUTEL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'EXPRIMER UNE SUBSTANCE COULANTE D'UN SACHET TUBULAIRE

Publication

EP 0915743 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940063 A

Priority

  • DE 29613945 U
  • DE 29617654 U
  • DE 29707761 U
  • DE 29709408 U
  • EP 9704338 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806506A1] The inventive device for squeezing flowable material includes a tubular bag (1) containing the material, as well as an ejection device (2, 5). The tubular bag (1) is inserted into a cylindrical chamber (10) of the ejection device (2, 5). Its open end (8) is located inside an outflow opening (9) of said device. The tubular bag (1) is clamped to the fore-part (11) with a sealing washer (13), the clamping member of which cooperates exclusively with the outflow opening (9) edge formed by the fore-part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/01; B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/01 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/0146 (2013.01); B05C 17/00576 (2013.01); B65D 83/0072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806506 A1 19980219; EP 0915743 A1 19990519; EP 0915743 B1 20010523; EP 0915744 A1 19990519; JP 2000516137 A 20001205; JP 2000516138 A 20001205; US 6206244 B1 20010327; US 6209755 B1 20010403; WO 9806505 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703610

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703610 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MUEHLBAUER, WOLFGANG CARL FRIEDRICH, DR.

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUEHLBAUER, ERNST ADOLF

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980924

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI