Global Patent Index - EP 0915904 A4

EP 0915904 A4 2001-05-02 - MAMMALIAN SEX COMB ON MIDLEG (MAMMALIAN SCM) ACTS AS A TUMOR SUPPRESSOR

Title (en)

MAMMALIAN SEX COMB ON MIDLEG (MAMMALIAN SCM) ACTS AS A TUMOR SUPPRESSOR

Title (de)

SÄUGETIER-POLYPEPTID (SÄUGETIER SCM)) ALS TUMOR-SUPPRESSOR

Title (fr)

GENE MAMMALIEN (Scm) A EFFET SUPPRESSEUR DE TUMEUR

Publication

EP 0915904 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97926403 A

Priority

  • US 9707575 W
  • US 1687696 P
  • US 1729496 P
  • US 2045096 P
  • US 3299496 P
  • US 3509097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742211A1] Mammalian Scm gene and amino acid sequences encoded by the mammalian Scm gene are described. The mammalian Scm gene and gene products are useful for diagnostic and therapeutic applications in proliferative and developmental disorders. Modulators of mammalian Scm can be identified using the disclosed genes. The modulators can be used in the context of cancer therapy or a treatment of a developmental disorder. Scm is also useful for inducing differentiation in a population of progenitor cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 31/70; A61K 39/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/63; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4745 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9316178 A2 19930819 - US ARMY [US]
  • [E] WO 9742218 A1 19971113 - CHIRON CORP [US]
  • [A] BORNEMANN DOUGLAS ET AL: "The Drosophila Polycomb group gene Sex comb on midleg (Scm) encodes a zinc finger protein with similarity to polyhomeotic protein.", DEVELOPMENT (CAMBRIDGE), vol. 122, no. 5, 1996, pages 1621 - 1630, XP002161672, ISSN: 0950-1991
  • [A] NOMURA M ET AL: "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF REINOIC ACID-INDUCIBLE CDNA CLONES IN F9 CELLS: ONE OF THE EARLY INDUCIBLE CLONES ENCODES A NOVEL PROTEIN SHARING SEVERAL HIGHLY HOMOLOGOUS REGIONS WITH A DROSOPHILA POLYHOMEOTIC PROTEIN", DIFFERENTIATION,DE,SPRINGER VERLAG, vol. 57, no. 1, 1 June 1994 (1994-06-01), pages 39 - 50, XP002046787, ISSN: 0301-4681
  • See also references of WO 9742211A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742211 A1 19971113; AU 2996797 A 19971126; AU 3117597 A 19971126; EP 0915904 A1 19990519; EP 0915904 A4 20010502; EP 0960120 A1 19991201; EP 0960120 A4 20010502; JP 2000510693 A 20000822; JP 2000513212 A 20001010; WO 9742218 A1 19971113

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7C 07K 16/18 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 39/00 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981127

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE