Global Patent Index - EP 0915994 B1

EP 0915994 B1 2000-06-21 - "WAELZ" METHOD FOR PROCESSING OF ZINC CONTAINING MATERIALS IN PELLETIZED FORM

Title (en)

"WAELZ" METHOD FOR PROCESSING OF ZINC CONTAINING MATERIALS IN PELLETIZED FORM

Title (de)

"WAELZ"VERFAHREN ZUR AUFARBEITUNG ZINK ENTHALTENDER ROHSTOFFE ON PELLETIERTER FORM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE "WAELZ" DE TRAITEMENT DE MATERIAUX BOULETES CONTENANT DU ZINC

Publication

EP 0915994 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97929050 A

Priority

  • BG 9700007 W
  • BG 10075496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804755A1] The invention is applied in non-ferrous metallurgy. Its application results in achieving high non-ferrous metals recovery from metallurgical semies and secondary raw materials at lower fuel consumption as well as in reducing the dust quantity in the outlet exhaust gases. According to the method, on the grounds of preset process parameters, a charge is made of zinc containing material, the powdered component of the solid fuel and an activator in the ratio of 8-12:2.5-7:0.8-1.5. The charge is mixed and pelletized. The produced pellets, 1-30 mm in diameter, and moisture content of 16-18 % and the rest of the solid fuel, necessary for the process are dosed by a preset program for technological control in the ratio of 3:1 and are fed into the Waelz kiln. Oxygen in the quantity of 3-12 m<3>/t of treated charge is blown in at the discharge end of the kilns. The gases exiting the kilns and containing non-ferrous metals are cooled and pass through a two-stage filtering in a filtering equipment. The dust loading of the exhaust gases after the first stage is up to 350 mg/Nm<3> and after the second stage - below 10 mg/Nm<3>. The metal oxides collected in the filters are pelletized, the pellets sizing 2-6 mm in diameter and the moisture content is 13.6-16 % and after that are sent for thermal treatment in a tube kiln, at the discharge end of which oxygen is blown in the quantity of 5-12 m<3>/t of oxides. The produced roasted metal oxides are further hydrometallurgically processed and the kiln gases are cooled, passed through a filtering equipment and the collected metal oxides are sent for additional cleaning and recovery, where the waste gases contain 4-8 mg/Nm<3> of dust.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 7/04; C22B 19/30; C22B 7/02; C22B 1/24; C22B 1/245; C22B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 1/245 (2006.01); C22B 7/02 (2006.01); C22B 7/04 (2006.01); C22B 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 19/30 (2013.01); C22B 1/245 (2013.01); C22B 7/02 (2013.01); C22B 7/04 (2013.01); Y02P 10/234 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804755 A1 19980205; BG 100754 A 19980130; BG 61917 B1 19980930; DE 69702349 D1 20000727; DE 69702349 T2 20010215; EP 0915994 A1 19990519; EP 0915994 B1 20000621; ES 2147006 T3 20000816; ZA 9706600 B 19980203

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702349

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KCM - AD

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-10-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KCM AD

- Effective date: 20111005

2011-10-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KCM AD, BG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KCM - S.A., PLOVDIV, BG

- Document: DE 69702349

- Effective date: 20110824

2011-10-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702349

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20110824

2011-08-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702349

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147006 T3

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702349 20000727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981215

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT