Global Patent Index - EP 0916002 B1

EP 0916002 B1 2002-09-25 - DEVICE FOR LAYING RAILS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LAYING RAILS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHIENENLEGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SERVANT A POSER DES RAILS

Publication

EP 0916002 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97933979 A

Priority

  • SE 9701308 W
  • SE 9602921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9805821A1] Device for laying railway track. When deploying a long rail in the course of tracklaying, it is desirable that the position of the rail relative to the sleeper be controlled and corrected as required. This is achieved if the roller (1) is free to move relative to the base (7), that is, in practice, relative to either the rail and/or the roadbed. This is achieved by mounting the roller (1) in a cradle (2) which is free to pivot in a base (7), the degree of movement of the roller/cradle relative to the base being limited by twin stops (4). The invention is provided with a carrying handle (6) to facilitate its practical use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/16; E01B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9805821 A1 19980212; AT 224980 T 20021015; AU 3714997 A 19980225; DE 69715872 D1 20021031; DE 69715872 T2 20030522; DK 0916002 T3 20030203; EP 0916002 A1 19990519; EP 0916002 B1 20020925; NO 312075 B1 20020311; NO 990500 A 19990326; NO 990500 D0 19990203; SE 507959 C2 19980803; SE 9602921 D0 19960805; SE 9602921 L 19980206

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040723

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030722

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715872 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224980 T 20021015

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-12-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR LAYING RAILS

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990218

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB SE