Global patent index - EP 0916013 B1

EP 0916013 B1 2000-03-01 - INSERTABLE CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR INSULATING GLASS PANE SPACERS

Title (en)

INSERTABLE CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR INSULATING GLASS PANE SPACERS

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDER FÜR ABSTANDHALTER VON ISOLIERGLASSCHEIBEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE LIAISON ENFICHABLE POUR ECARTEUR DE PLAQUES DE VERRE ISOLANT

Publication

EP 0916013 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940054 A

Priority

  • DE 29613519 U
  • EP 9704196 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ295710B6] The present invention relates to a distance holder (2) intended for insulating glass panes, said holder comprising one or several hollow sections (3, 4) with a straight insertable connecting element (1) inserted at the connection point (5) and being guided within the hollow section (3, 4) or hollow sections (3, 4). Said insertable connecting element (1) is provided with at least one small, thin-walled stop (12) acting from both sides and having sides (13), which are parallel or at an acute angle. The stop (12) inserts fully into the section face walls (6) upon pushing the sections (3, 4) together, so that the sidewalls (6) tightly abut above the stop (12). In the straight insertable connecting element (1) for a metallic distance holder (2) of insulating glass panes with at least one projecting, rigid stop (12) acting on both sides for face walls (6) of one or more hollow sections (3, 4) inserted at a connection point (5), said stop (12) is small and has sides (13), which are parallel or at an acute angle to completely penetrate into face walls (6) of the hollow section (3, 4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/667

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29613519 U1 19971211; AT 190116 T 20000315; CZ 295710 B6 20051012; CZ 9900385 A3 20000614; DK 0916013 T3 20000605; DK 0916013 T4 20070529; EP 0916013 A1 19990519; EP 0916013 B1 20000301; EP 0916013 B2 20070214; ES 2143322 T3 20000501; ES 2143322 T5 20071016; HK 1020080 A1 20000818; PL 189228 B1 20050729; PL 189230 B1 20050729; PL 331482 A1 19990719; WO 9805843 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KRONENBERG, RALF M., DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59701192

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701192

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701192

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2007-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRONENBERG, MAX

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-07-13 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-07-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2007-05-30 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-05-29 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2007-04-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-03-30 [REG HK AM43] AMENDMENT OF STANDARD PATENT FOLLOWING OPPOSITION OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS IN THE DESIGNATED PATENT OFFICE (ACC. SECT 43 PATENT ORDINANCE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: AM43

- Ref Document Number: 1020080

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-02-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

2005-01-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Effective date: 20001124

2004-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

2004-09-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Effective date: 20001124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

2001-01-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CERA HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143322

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701192

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190116

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL