Global Patent Index - EP 0916028 B1

EP 0916028 B1 2000-11-08 - VALVE ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

VALVE ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

VENTILANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE CLAPET

Publication

EP 0916028 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97938868 A

Priority

  • DE 19631693 A
  • EP 9704223 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631693A1] The valve arrangement comprises two silicon wafers placed on top of each other. The downstream wafer contains a majority of etched through openings (6). The upstream wafer (3) is equipped with a majority a swing valves (7). The latter are modelled by etching the silicon and are located in through frame openings (8). They are connected to the wafer (3) by membrane-type webs (9) enabling elastic opening and closing movements. The individual swing valves (7) contain differing amounts and differing sizes of through openings (6), thereby enabling a widely adjustable range of dynamic pressure and flow control through selective actuation of the valves. The swing valves (7) are actuated by electrical means, resulting in capacitive forces of repulsion and attraction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15C 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631693 A1 19980212; EP 0916028 A1 19990519; EP 0916028 B1 20001108; WO 9805871 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702612

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GASWARME-INSTITUT E.V.

- Effective date: 20050831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060802

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702612 20001214

2000-12-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

2000-11-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991207

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990202

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL