Global Patent Index - EP 0916273 B1

EP 0916273 B1 2002-11-06 - Skiboot

Title (en)

Skiboot

Title (de)

Schischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 0916273 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98810791 A

Priority

CH 259797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916273A1] The boot has an upper in the form of a plastic shell (1) of variable volume which closes over the foot and lower leg by means of two flaps (10, 11) and fastenings (5, 6). The outside of the shell has zones (12, 13) of substantially lower rigidity than the remainder of the shell, situated on either side of a more rigid strip (15) extending obliquely from the heel to the top of the foot and carrying parts (5a, 6a) of the clasps. The two zones of reduced rigidity are located in the metatarsal/phalangeal joint region and between the heel and malleolus, while the strip (15) is curved in the approximate shape of an arc with its center situated below or in front of the boot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0482 (2013.01); A43B 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916273 A1 19990519; EP 0916273 B1 20021106; CH 691753 A5 20011015; DE 69809173 D1 20021212; DE 69809173 T2 20030417; US 2002062580 A1 20020530; US 6474004 B2 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809173 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011113

2000-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990201

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI