Global Patent Index - EP 0916288 A3

EP 0916288 A3 2000-09-20 - Furniture assembly for sitting and lying

Title (en)

Furniture assembly for sitting and lying

Title (de)

Sitz/Liege-Möbelgruppe

Title (fr)

Ensemble de meubles d'assise et de couchage

Publication

EP 0916288 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121382 A

Priority

IT BZ970056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916288A2] The sofa-bed has a seat (2) with a fixed seat/bed surface (11) and a movable seat/bed surface (13), linked together by a swing mechanism (15) to a sliding trolley (12) which can be pushed into a furniture unit. A second seat (3) is spaced apart from the first seat (2). When the seats are extended, their bed surfaces (11,18) are at the same level. A table flap (6) at the rear wall can be pulled down between the two seat/bed units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/04; A47C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 13/00 (2006.01); A47C 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 13/005 (2013.01); A47C 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916288 A2 19990519; EP 0916288 A3 20000920; EP 0916288 B1 20040211; AT 259181 T 20040215; DE 59810742 D1 20040318; IT 1296394 B1 19990625; IT BZ970056 A1 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59810742

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101110

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AHRO POLSTERMOEBEL G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AHRO POLSTERMOEBEL G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810742

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AHRO POLSTERMOEBEL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI