Global Patent Index - EP 0916289 A3

EP 0916289 A3 2000-11-22 - Driving arrangement for an electric height adjusting device

Title (en)

Driving arrangement for an electric height adjusting device

Title (de)

Antriebsanordnung einer elektromotorischen Höhenverstelleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'entrainement pour dispositif de réglage en hauteur électrique

Publication

EP 0916289 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119905 A

Priority

DE 29720337 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916289A2] The drive device has a pair of drive units (10) at both the head and the foot of the bed, each incorporating at least one electric motor (16), used for rotating height adjustment nuts (14) fitted to threaded spindles (13) within the vertical supports at the adjacent corners of the bed frame. Each height adjustment nut is contained within a guide housing (15) which is blocked against rotation and which is formed as a hollow profile displaced longitudinally along the threaded spindle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 19/00; A47C 17/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/04 (2006.01); A61G 7/012 (2006.01); B66F 7/02 (2006.01); A61G 7/018 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/045 (2013.01); A61G 7/012 (2013.01); B66F 7/025 (2013.01); A61G 7/018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720337 U1 19980122; EP 0916289 A2 19990519; EP 0916289 A3 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 19/00 A, 7A 47C 17/84 B

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI