Global Patent Index - EP 0916290 A3

EP 0916290 A3 2000-11-29 - Convertible piece of furniture which can be converted from a sofa and/or single bed into a bunk bed

Title (en)

Convertible piece of furniture which can be converted from a sofa and/or single bed into a bunk bed

Title (de)

In ein Etagenbett umwandelbares Sofa oder Einzelbett

Title (fr)

Canapé ou lit unique transformable en un lit superposé

Publication

EP 0916290 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120829 A

Priority

IT CO970019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916290A2] A furniture unit composed of two bedsprings (11,15) which, in the folded position, acts as sofa or single bed; by rotating the extra bed (11,47), which, in the folded position, is arranged upside down below the sofa (15,46,54), the lower bed is arranged above the sofa in a bunk-bed configuration. The ladder (60) and the associated barrier are folded up and hinged horizontally to the rear long side of the second bed (11,47) when the second bed is not being used; during conversion into a bunk bed, they rotate together with the bed and are arranged on the outer side thereon. The ladder (60), by rotating about two pivots, is arranged vertically, acting as ladder and as support for the open unit, and the safety barrier of the upper bed rises as the ladder, to which it is articulated, rotates. By performing the operations in reverse, the piece of furniture is converted back into a sofa. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 19/20; A47C 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] FR 1015915 A 19521028
  • [A] CH 371231 A 19630815 - OTT ADOLF [CH]
  • [A] PRODUCT LICENSING INDEX., no. 177, 1 July 1972 (1972-07-01) - 31 July 1972 (1972-07-31), INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT., GB, pages 37 - 38, XP002148330, ISSN: 0374-4353

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916290 A2 19990519; EP 0916290 A3 20001129; EP 0916290 B1 20040211; AT 259182 T 20040215; DE 69821575 D1 20040318; ES 2147541 T1 20000916; ES 2147541 T3 20040716; IT 1295754 B1 19990527; IT CO970019 A1 19990506; IT CO970019 D0 19971105

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141102

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141102

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147541 T3

2004-05-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821575 P 20040318

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010224

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 19/20 A, 7A 47C 17/16 B

2000-09-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147541 T1

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI