Global Patent Index - EP 0916291 B1

EP 0916291 B1 2001-05-09 - Refrigerated vending counter and method for determinating a refrigerated vending counter

Title (en)

Refrigerated vending counter and method for determinating a refrigerated vending counter

Title (de)

Warenkühltheke und Hygienisierungsverfahren für eine Warenkühltheke

Title (fr)

Vitrine réfrigérée et procédé de stérilisation d'une vitrine réfrigérée

Publication

EP 0916291 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120732 A

Priority

DE 19749971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916291A1] A separate compressor system (24) cools the evaporator (16) of the display cabinet (1) and chilled air is circulated by a fan (20). Hot defrosting gas may be circulated through the evaporator through a pipe (42) controlled by a control unit (23) during which time the sterilizing lamp (22) is switched on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); F25B 47/02 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0482 (2013.01); A47F 3/0456 (2013.01); F25B 47/022 (2013.01); F25D 17/042 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0417 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749971 A1 19990506; AT 200963 T 20010515; EP 0916291 A1 19990519; EP 0916291 B1 20010509; ES 2157634 T3 20010816; US 6237350 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800685

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2012-04-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800685

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157634 T3

2001-07-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800685 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200963 T 20010515

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990813

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI