Global patent index - EP 0916293 A3

EP 0916293 A3 2000-12-06 - Watch-strap holder plate

Title (en)

Watch-strap holder plate

Title (de)

Trägerplatte für ein Uhrenarmband

Title (fr)

Plaque destinée à supporter un bracelet de montre

Publication

EP 0916293 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118335 A

Priority

IT PD970078 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916293A2] A watch-strap holder plate comprising a body (11) from which two pins (12) protrude monolithically from mutually opposite positions and are hinged to the body (11); the pins (12) engage, by means of their free ends (15), in complementarily shaped seats (17) which are rigidly coupled to the body (11). Each one of the pins (12) is suitable to enter the seat (17) formed at each end of a watch-strap for display. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/02; G04B 37/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2006.01); G04B 37/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/022 (2013.01); G04B 37/1486 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916293 A2 19990519; EP 0916293 A3 20001206; IT 238572 Y1 20001113; IT PD970078 U1 19990513; IT PD970078 V0 19971113

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020322

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI