Global patent index - EP 0916300 A3

EP 0916300 A3 2000-03-22 - Shower partition

Title (en)

Shower partition

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Cloison de douche

Publication

EP 0916300 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119682 A

Priority

DE 19750297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916300A2] The partition has one or more door sections (1), and a wall in two parts (4',4''). For a fixed dividing wall, the division is at the lower one-third of the wall. The lower section (4'') can be drawn out at any time, on guide rails (b,b1), for easy cleaning of the area between the shower wall and the bath tub or other neighboring zones. The lower guide profiles (b,b1) are of plastics, with the bottom profile section bonded to the shower tray.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; A47K 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916300 A2 19990519; EP 0916300 A3 20000322; DE 19750297 A1 19990602; DE 19750297 C2 20021031

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020304

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI