Global Patent Index - EP 0916369 A3

EP 0916369 A3 2001-05-09 - Method and arragement for attaching a filter to a repiratory apparatus

Title (en)

Method and arragement for attaching a filter to a repiratory apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Befestigung eines filtermittels an eine Atemschutzgerät

Title (fr)

Procédé et agencement pour fixer un moyen de filtration à un appareil respiratoire

Publication

EP 0916369 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98660114 A

Priority

FI 974123 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916369A2] A filter (301, 403) to be attached to a respiratory apparatus comprises an attachment boss (303) having an outer surface and an inner surface. A certain first part (401, 402) of the respiratory apparatus comprises a cylindrical portion (306, 407) having an outer diameter smaller than the inner diameter of the attachment boss. The arrangement comprises means (308, 411, 412, 410) for forming a sealing zone between the outer surface of the said cylindrical portion and the inner surface of the said attachment boss. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916369 A2 19990519; EP 0916369 A3 20010509; EP 0916369 B1 20120118; FI 117161 B 20060714; FI 974123 A0 19971104; FI 974123 A 19990505

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69842572

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131104

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842572

- Effective date: 20121019

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-04-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-03-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842572

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842572

2012-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2012-01-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080418

2005-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCOTT HEALTH AND SAFETY OY

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 62B 23/02 A

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI