Global Patent Index - EP 0916413 A3

EP 0916413 A3 2000-07-12 - Washing installation

Title (en)

Washing installation

Title (de)

Waschanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de lavage

Publication

EP 0916413 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121431 A

Priority

DE 19750669 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916413A2] The washing plant has a drum (10) to receive the work pieces (30) during cleaning, and a spray device (18) with jets to spray cleaning fluid on the work pieces in the drum. A feed device feeds the work pieces to the drum individually. A rotating screw conveyor (20) passing axially through the drum carries the work pieces through it individually. The screw conveyor is composed of a number of angle segments running round a central axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B08B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/042 (2013.01); B08B 3/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916413 A2 19990519; EP 0916413 A3 20000712; DE 19750669 A1 19990527; DE 19750669 C2 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI LU

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR LI LU

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 08B 3/02 A, 7B 08B 3/04 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR LI LU

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI